1. EASY

\( 450 \times 20 = \)

 
2. EASY

\( 111 \times 11 = \)

 
3. EASY

\( 115 \times 25 = \)

 
4. MEDIUM

\( 384 \times 87 = \)

 
5. MEDIUM

\( 778 \times 16 = \)

 
6. MEDIUM

\( 650 \times 22 = \)

 
7. HARD

\( 794 \times 36 = \)

 
8. HARD

\( 387 \times 93 = \)

 
9. HARD

\( 846 \times 74 = \)

 
10. HARD

\( 999 \times 99 = \)